Assembly | 06/05/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1203.) | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1476.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2013 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2013 | Introduced. To print. |