|
09/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2363.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 8. Page 2967.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2848.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 899.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).
|
|
|