Assembly | 06/17/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3701.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3162.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2014 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |