Senate | 05/01/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |