Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3343.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |