|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 749, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4719.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 6019.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5966.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3649.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3441.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|