Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3401.) (May 7). | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3255.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |