|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 924, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4720.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6238.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3018.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|