06/28/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2014. | |||
06/28/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2014 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3320.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3121.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |