|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 195, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4295.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5745.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5704.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3325.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3162.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|