California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014