|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4295.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5746.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on TRANS.) suspended. (Page 5545.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 3439.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3401.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|