Assembly | 06/25/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5645.) | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3328.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3091.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2014 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |