Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6283.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3386.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3233.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|