California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 2, 2014
Bill March 26, 2014