California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014