LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1053
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1053
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1053
Compare Versions
SB1053 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB1053 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1053 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1053 Amended July 2, 2014
SB1053 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1053 Amended May 28, 2014
SB1053 Amended April 22, 2014
SB1053 Amended April 9, 2014
SB1053 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1053 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB1053 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1053 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1053 Amended July 2, 2014
SB1053 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1053 Amended May 28, 2014
SB1053 Amended April 22, 2014
SB1053 Amended April 9, 2014
SB1053 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare