Senate | 05/27/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3708.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3338.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 2992.) (March 26). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |