California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 30, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014