Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2014 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3233.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |