California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1066 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill July 3, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014