Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
From committee: That the bill be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2550.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 1114.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|