|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6223.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6129.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3708.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3078.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|