Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2950.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1005.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 487.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 405.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected December 4.)
|
|
|