Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2976.) (March 26). | ||
Senate | 03/11/2014 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |