|
08/16/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1681.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 2245.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 908.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|