Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5606.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3662.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3709.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3213.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22 in HUMAN S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3118.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|