|
09/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 440, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4547.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6048.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3213.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|