Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3092.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|