California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 8, 2014

Amended

Bill June 15, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014