California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 25, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014