LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1160
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1160
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1160
Compare Versions
SB1160 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1160 Amended June 25, 2014
SB1160 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1160 Amended April 24, 2014
SB1160 Amended April 3, 2014
SB1160 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1160 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1160 Amended June 25, 2014
SB1160 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1160 Amended April 24, 2014
SB1160 Amended April 3, 2014
SB1160 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare