California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014