|
07/07/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5703.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|