Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3039.) (April 1). | ||
Senate | 03/07/2014 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |