California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill April 23, 2014
Bill March 27, 2014