Senate | 04/24/2014 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 8. Page 3282.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |