Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 3605.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3711.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|