|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 839, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6402.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5847.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on ED.) suspended. (Page 5606.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2976.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|