|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 516, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 6228.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on TRANS.) suspended. (Page 5545.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 3651.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected June 2.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3711.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3313.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|