California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1183 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/25/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1183AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 25, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 24, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator DeSaulnier FEBRUARY 20, 2014 An act to add  an   d repeal  Section 9251  to   of  the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1183, as amended, DeSaulnier. Vehicle registration fees: surcharge for bicycle infrastructure. Existing law provides for the imposition of  certain  registration fees on motor vehicles, including  certain   additional, specified  fees imposed by local agencies for  various specified   transportation-related  purposes. This bill would authorize a city, county, or regional park district to impose  and collect  , as a special tax, a motor vehicle registration surcharge of not more than $5 for bicycle infrastructure purposes  until January 1, 2025  . The bill would require the Department of Motor Vehicles to administer the surcharge and to transmit the net revenues from the surcharge to the local agency. The bill would require the local agency to use these revenues for improvements to paved and natural surface trails and bikeways, including existing and new trails and bikeways and other bicycle facilities, and for associated maintenance purposes. The bill would limit to 5% the amount of net revenues that may be used by the local agency for its administrative expenses in implementing these provisions.  The bill would require a local agency that imposes the $5 surcharge to submit an annual fiscal year-end report to the Legislature that includes, among other things, the total net revenues received and expended during the previous fiscal year and a summary of the infrastructure and projects funded by the surcharge.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 9251 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 9251. (a) In addition to any other fees specified in this code, a city, county, or regional park district may impose, as a special tax subject to two-thirds voter approval in the jurisdiction in which it is imposed, pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 2 of Article XIII C of the California Constitution, a local motor vehicle registration surcharge, in whole dollars not to exceed five dollars ($5), on each vehicle registered within the jurisdiction of the agency imposing the surcharge, except vehicles that are expressly exempted from payment of registration fees. The amount of the surcharge shall be specified in an ordinance adopted by the local agency.  The   surcharge shall terminate on January 1, 2025.  The surcharge shall be administered by the department, with revenues, after deduction of collection costs, to be distributed to the local agency, for expenditure pursuant to subdivision (b). (b) The net revenues from the surcharge shall be used by the local agency for improvements to paved and natural surface trails and bikeways, including the rehabilitation, restoration, and expansion of existing trails and bikeways, the development of new trails and bikeways, the improvement and development of other bicycle facilities, including, but not limited to, bicycle parking facilities, and the maintenance and upkeep of local and regional trail and bikeway systems, networks, and other bicycle facilities. Not more than 5 percent of the net revenues may be used by the local agency for its administrative expenses in implementing this section.  (c) Any local agency that imposes a surcharge pursuant to subdivision (a) shall provide an annual fiscal year-end report to the Legislature that shall include the following information:   (1) The total net revenues received from the surcharge and expended during the previous fiscal year.   (2) A summary of the infrastructure and projects funded pursuant to subdivision (b).   (c)   (d)  For purposes of this section, "regional park district" shall have the same meaning as "district" as defined in Section 5500 of the Public Resources Code.  (e) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2025, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2025, deletes or extends that date.