Assembly | 08/07/2014 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3360.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3295.) (April 29). | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |