|
08/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 223, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5916.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3216.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|