Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 5. Page 589.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |