Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2014 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3308.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |