Senate | 04/28/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3278.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2014 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2014 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |