|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2671.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|