California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill March 27, 2014