08/21/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2014. | |||
08/21/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5903.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3144.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3037.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/21/2014 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |