Senate | 05/23/2014 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2014 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2014 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2014 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2977.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2014 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |